AK HB341 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming the Marvin Thurmond Galena Maintenance and Operation Station.
Title
Marvin Thurmond Galena Maint. Station
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-03-27 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | NR: TOBIN, WILSON |
2024-03-27 | Senate | DP: KAUFMAN, MYERS |
2024-03-27 | Senate | TRA RPT 2DP 2NR |
2024-03-15 | Senate | TRA |
2024-03-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-13 | House | VERSION: HB 341 |
2024-03-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-03-13 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2024-03-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 341 |
2024-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2024-03-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CALENDAR |
2024-03-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2024-03-06 | House | DP: MINA, STUTES, MCKAY, VANCE, SUMNER, C.JOHNSON, MCCABE |
2024-03-06 | House | TRA RPT 7DP |
2024-02-20 | House | TRA |
2024-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |