AK HB311 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the filing of information with, and to information filed with, the Alaska Public Offices Commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reports To Apoc
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2012-02-22 | SIGNED INTO LAW 2/20 CHAPTER 1 SLA 12 | |
2012-02-17 | 10:29 AM 2/16/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-02-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y31 E9 | |
2012-02-15 | CC RPT ADPTD Y26 N5 E9 CCS HB 311 | |
2012-02-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-15 | CC RPT ADPTD Y14 N2 E4 CCS HB 311 | |
2012-02-15 | CC REPORT READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2012-02-15 | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) | |
2012-02-15 | (TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE) | |
2012-02-15 | CC REPORT: CCS HB 311 | |
2012-02-15 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2012-02-15 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2012-02-15 | FAILED TO RECEDE MESSAGE | |
2012-02-15 | MEYER (CHAIR), HOFFMAN, STEVENS | |
2012-02-15 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2012-02-15 | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y1 N15 E4 | |
2012-02-15 | RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2012-02-13 | HAWKER (CHAIR), JOHNSON, KERTTULA | |
2012-02-13 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2012-02-13 | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N33 E6 A1 | |
2012-02-13 | CONCUR MESSAGE | |
2012-02-13 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 311(RLS) | |
2012-02-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-02-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-13 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N2 E1 A1 | |
2012-02-13 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-13 | MEYER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2012-02-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-13 | PASSED Y17 N2 E1 | |
2012-02-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 311(RLS) | |
2012-02-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-13 | RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-02-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/2012 | |
2012-02-13 | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) | |
2012-02-13 | NR: ELLIS, STEDMAN, MEYER | |
2012-02-13 | DP: STEVENS, HOFFMAN | |
2012-02-13 | RLS RPT SCS (RLS) 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE | |
2012-02-10 | RLS | |
2012-02-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-02-10 | VERSION: CSHB 311(STA) AM | |
2012-02-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-02-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-10 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N1 E4 | |
2012-02-10 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC | |
2012-02-10 | HAWKER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2012-02-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-10 | PASSED Y35 N1 E4 | |
2012-02-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 311(STA) AM | |
2012-02-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-10 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N33 E3 | |
2012-02-10 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-10 | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-02-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2012 | |
2012-02-10 | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) | |
2012-02-10 | AM: JOHANSEN | |
2012-02-10 | DP: P.WILSON, KELLER, PETERSEN, SEATON, LYNN | |
2012-02-10 | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 5DP 1AM | |
2012-02-01 | STA | |
2012-02-01 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |