AK HB31 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring school districts to develop and require completion of a history of American constitutionalism curriculum segment; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Constitutional History Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Steve Thompson [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] | Rep. Dan Saddler [R] |
Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Alan Austerman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-02-07 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-02-07 | House | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2014-02-07 | House | AM: GUTTENBERG |
2014-02-07 | House | NR: GARA, MUNOZ, EDGMON, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, STOLTZE |
2014-02-07 | House | DP: COSTELLO, THOMPSON |
2014-02-07 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 6NR 1AM |
2013-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2013-03-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2013-03-27 | House | NR: SEATON, DRUMMOND |
2013-03-27 | House | DP: REINBOLD, P.WILSON, LEDOUX, SADDLER, GATTIS |
2013-03-27 | House | EDC RPT 5DP 2NR |
2013-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2013-01-16 | House | EDC, FIN |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13 |