AK HB279 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination dates of the Board of Nursing, the Board of Dental Examiners, the Board of Barbers and Hairdressers, the Big Game Commercial Services Board, the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board, and the Alaska Seismic Hazards Safety Commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extending Certain Boards & Commissions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2012-05-21 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/17 CHAPTER 23 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-11 | 2:06 PM 5/11/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 279(FIN) AM S | |
2012-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 279(FIN) AM S | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION | |
2012-04-15 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N8 | |
2012-04-15 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/15/2012 | |
2012-04-15 | FN9: (DPS) | |
2012-04-15 | FN8: (DNR) | |
2012-04-15 | FN7: (CED) | |
2012-04-15 | FN6: (CED) | |
2012-04-15 | FN5: (CED) | |
2012-04-15 | FN4: (CED) | |
2012-04-15 | NR: OLSON | |
2012-04-15 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2012-04-15 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 38 | |
2012-04-15 | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2012-02-29 | FIN | |
2012-02-29 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-02-27 | VERSION: CSHB 279(FIN) | |
2012-02-27 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-02-27 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-27 | PASSED Y36 E4 | |
2012-02-27 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 279(FIN) | |
2012-02-27 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-27 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-27 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-02-27 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2012 | |
2012-02-24 | FN9: (DPS) | |
2012-02-24 | FN8: (DNR) | |
2012-02-24 | FN7: (CED) | |
2012-02-24 | FN6: (CED) | |
2012-02-24 | FN5: (CED) | |
2012-02-24 | FN4: (CED) | |
2012-02-24 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-02-24 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP | |
2012-01-23 | FN3: (DPS) | |
2012-01-23 | FN2: (DNR) | |
2012-01-23 | FN1: (CED) | |
2012-01-23 | DP: THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, MILLER, OLSON | |
2012-01-23 | L&C RPT 5DP | |
2012-01-17 | L&C, FIN | |
2012-01-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alcohol
Boards & Commissions
Dentists
Disaster
Fish & Game (game)
Guides
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Sunset
Boards & Commissions
Dentists
Disaster
Fish & Game (game)
Guides
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Sunset