AK HB243 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act reducing the draw permit application fee for bison to $5; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bison Draw Permit Application Fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-02 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2024-01-31 | House | FN1: (DFG) |
2024-01-31 | House | NR: DIBERT, SADDLER, WRIGHT, MCCABE |
2024-01-31 | House | DP: BAKER, RAUSCHER, MCKAY |
2024-01-31 | House | RES RPT 3DP 4NR |
2024-01-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2024-01-16 | House | RES |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/24 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB243 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0243A.PDF |