AK HB236 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN3: (S.FIN/DHS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN3: (S.FIN/DHS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the Alaska senior benefits payment program.
Title
Extend: Senior Benefits Payment Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | FN3: (S.FIN/DHS) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/8/18 |
2018-05-12 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/10 CHAPTER 8 SLA 18 |
2018-05-07 | House | 9:37 AM 5/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 236(FIN) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 236(FIN) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | FN3: (S.FIN/DHS) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2018-04-13 | Senate | FIN RPT 7DP |
2018-02-09 | Senate | STEDMAN, HUGHES, EGAN, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, WILSON, OLSON, MEYER, MACKINNON |
2018-02-09 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, KELLY, GIESSEL, STEVENS, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, COSTELLO |
2018-02-09 | Senate | FIN |
2018-02-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-02-07 | House | VERSION: CSHB 236(FIN) |
2018-02-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-02-07 | House | WOOL, LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON |
2018-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, GARA, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, PARISH, TARR, MILLETT, SEATON, |
2018-02-07 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N1 E4 |
2018-02-07 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-02-07 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-02-07 | House | PASSED Y35 N1 E4 |
2018-02-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 236(FIN) |
2018-02-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-02-07 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-02-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-07 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 2/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | FN2: (DHS) |
2018-02-07 | House | SEATON |
2018-02-07 | House | DP: TILTON, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, KAWASAKI, GARA, WILSON, FOSTER, |
2018-02-07 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP |
2018-02-07 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2018-02-07 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2018-02-07 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-02-07 | House | HSS RPT 4DP 1AM |
2018-01-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2018-01-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2017-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2017-04-17 | House | HSS, FIN |
2017-04-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |