AK HB208 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to trusts and powers of appointment; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Trusts; Comm Prop Trusts; Powers Of Appt
Sponsors
Rep. DeLena Johnson [R] | Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. Colleen Sullivan-Leonard [R] | Rep. Steve Thompson [R] |
Rep. Charles Kopp [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-31 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, GARDNER |
2018-01-31 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MEYER |
2018-01-31 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 2NR |
2017-05-11 | Senate | L&C, JUD |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-05-10 | House | VERSION: HB 208 |
2017-05-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-05-10 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2017-05-08 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION - RECON HELD TO 5/10 |
2017-05-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2017-05-05 | House | TARR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2017-05-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y33 E7 |
2017-05-05 | House | PASSED Y26 N7 E7 |
2017-05-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 208 |
2017-05-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR |
2017-05-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-05-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2017 |
2017-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-04-15 | House | NR: EASTMAN, FANSLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, LEDOUX, REINBOLD |
2017-04-15 | House | DP: KOPP, CLAMAN |
2017-04-15 | House | JUD RPT 2DP 5NR |
2017-03-31 | House | JUD |
2017-03-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Assessments
Civil Procedure
Claims
Courts
Death
Deeds
Estates
Land
Marriage
Property
Rights
Sales
Torts
Trusts
Wills
Civil Procedure
Claims
Courts
Death
Deeds
Estates
Land
Marriage
Property
Rights
Sales
Torts
Trusts
Wills