AK HB201 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - COSPONSOR(S): KITO III
Pending: House Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - COSPONSOR(S): KITO III
Pending: House Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the application of non-aerial pesticides and broadcast chemicals near fish habitat or water for human consumption, and in public places.
Title
Pesticides And Broadcast Chemicals
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Beth Kerttula [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] |
Rep. Sam Kito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2014-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2013-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2013-04-08 | House | REFERRED TO FISHERIES |
2013-04-08 | House | FSH, RES |
2013-04-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB201 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0201A.PDF |