AK HB2 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - MOTION TO PLACE BILL ON CALENDAR FAILED Y2 N38
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to contracts with public agencies; and relating to the State of Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts: Prohibit Israel Discrimination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - House - House: Rules Committee Place on Calendar (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-16HouseMOTION TO PLACE BILL ON CALENDAR FAILED Y2 N38
2023-05-13HouseRETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
2023-05-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
2023-05-12HouseRAUSCHER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2023-05-12HouseVERSION: CSHB 2(STA)(FLD H)
2023-05-12HouseFAILED PASSAGE Y20 N20
2023-05-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(STA)
2023-05-11HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR
2023-05-11HouseAM NO 6 FAILED Y17 N23
2023-05-11HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y19 N21
2023-05-11HouseAM 1 TO AM 5 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2023-05-11HouseAM NO 5 OFFERED
2023-05-11HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y12 N28
2023-05-11HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y13 N27
2023-05-11HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N39
2023-05-11HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N39
2023-05-11HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2023-05-11HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-05-11HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2023
2023-03-17HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2023-03-17HouseNR: ALLARD
2023-03-17HouseDNP: STORY
2023-03-17HouseDP: C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, WRIGHT, SHAW
2023-03-17HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 4DP 1DNP 1NR
2023-01-19HouseSTA
2023-01-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2023-01-19HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB2
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0002A.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0002B.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/F/HB0002-1-2-031723-ADM-N.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0002C.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01037#AM1
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01037#AM2
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01038#AM3
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01039#AM4
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01041#AM5
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01041#AM6
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01070#1070
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2&Page=01151#1151

Bill Comments

feedback