AK HB190 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the Alaska children's trust and relating to the trust; establishing a children's trust grant account; relating to birth certificates and certificates of marriage; relating to special request Alaska children's trust license plates; and amending the State Procurement Code to exempt the Alaska children's trust and the Alaska Children's Trust Board.
Title
Children's Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/1 CHAPTER 115 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:35 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: CSHB 190(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, MEYER, PASKVAN, ELLIS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, FRENCH | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 190(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/10 | |
2010-04-18 | FN4: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-04-18 | FN3: ZERO(H.FIN/DHS) | |
2010-04-18 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-18 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-04-18 | FIN RPT 7DP | |
2010-04-11 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIS | |
2010-04-11 | HSS REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2010-04-10 | HSS, FIN | |
2010-04-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-09 | VERSION: CSHB 190(FIN) | |
2010-04-09 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-09 | COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, KERTTULA, DAHLSTROM, TUCK, PETERSEN | |
2010-04-09 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2010-04-09 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 190(FIN) | |
2010-04-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-09 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | FN4: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-04-06 | FN3: ZERO(H.FIN/DHS) | |
2010-04-06 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-06 | NR: THOMAS, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, SALMON | |
2010-04-06 | DP: DOOGAN, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-06 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 4NR | |
2009-04-15 | FN1: ZERO(REV) | |
2009-04-15 | NR: KELLER, HERRON | |
2009-04-15 | DP: HOLMES, SEATON, CISSNA | |
2009-04-15 | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 3DP 2NR | |
2009-03-16 | HSS, FIN | |
2009-03-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Child Abuse
Funds
Grants
Licensing
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurements
Public Finance
Trusts
Vital Statistics
Funds
Grants
Licensing
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurements
Public Finance
Trusts
Vital Statistics