AK HB186 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming the irene Webber Bridge.
Title
Naming Irene Webber Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-09 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2020-03-09 | House | JOHNSTON, FOSTER |
2020-03-09 | House | DP: ORTIZ, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, |
2020-03-09 | House | FIN RPT 10DP |
2020-02-17 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA |
2020-02-07 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2020-02-07 | House | DP: STORY, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, EDGMON, STUTES |
2020-02-07 | House | TRA RPT 6DP |
2020-01-21 | House | TRA |
2020-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB186 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0186A.PDF |