AK HB183 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to school athletics, recreation, athletic teams, and sports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Designate Sex For School-sponsored Sports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2024-04-15 | House | DNP: GRAY, GROH |
2024-04-15 | House | DP: C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, SUMNER, ALLARD, VANCE |
2024-04-15 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 2DNP |
2024-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2024-03-25 | House | AM: RUFFRIDGE |
2024-03-25 | House | NR: PRAX |
2024-03-25 | House | DNP: HIMSCHOOT, STORY, MCCORMICK |
2024-03-25 | House | DP: MCKAY, ALLARD |
2024-03-25 | House | EDC RPT 2DP 3DNP 1NR 1AM |
2023-05-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY |
2023-04-28 | House | EDC, JUD |
2023-04-28 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Claims
Disclosure
Education
Liability
Rights
School Districts
Schools
Sports
Universities
Women
Civil Procedure
Claims
Disclosure
Education
Liability
Rights
School Districts
Schools
Sports
Universities
Women
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB183 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0183A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0183B.PDF |