AK HB181 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to mental health education.
Title
Public Schools: Mental Health Education
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Grier Hopkins [D] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] |
Rep. Tiffany Zulkosky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | House | FN2: (EED) |
2020-03-18 | House | NR: MERRICK |
2020-03-18 | House | DNP: CARPENTER, TILTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2020-03-18 | House | DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSTON, FOSTER |
2020-03-18 | House | FIN RPT CS(EDC) 7DP 3DNP 1NR |
2020-03-02 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2020-03-02 | House | NR: JOHNSON, PRAX |
2020-03-02 | House | DP: HOPKINS, ZULKOSKY, DRUMMOND, STORY |
2020-03-02 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 4DP 2NR |
2020-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY |
2020-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2020-01-21 | House | EDC, FIN |
2020-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB181 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0181A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0181B.PDF |