AK HB169 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the authority of the Regulatory Commission of Alaska to regulate the production and distribution of telephone directories.
Title
Rca Regulation Of Telephone Directories
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate:
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
CSHB 169(L&C) Third Reading - Final Passage(Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/14 |
2014-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 64 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | House | 9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 169(L&C) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-21 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-21 | Senate | EGAN, MICCICHE |
2014-04-21 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, DYSON, MCGUIRE, FAIRCLOUGH, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEDMAN, |
2014-04-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 169(L&C) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-21 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N11 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/20 - ON 4/21 CALENDAR |
2014-04-20 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/14 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE |
2014-04-16 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 1NR |
2014-04-04 | Senate | L&C |
2014-04-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-03 | House | VERSION: CSHB 169(L&C) |
2014-04-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-03 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2014-04-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 169(L&C) |
2014-04-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-03 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-03 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2014-04-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2014 |
2013-04-08 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2013-04-08 | House | DP: HERRON, CHENAULT, REINBOLD, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER, OLSON |
2013-04-08 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP |
2013-03-15 | House | L&C |
2013-03-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |