AK HB155 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - FN2: (GOV)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - FN2: (GOV)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Alaska Military Affairs Commission; relating to the duties and powers of the Alaska Military Affairs Commission; relating to the Joint Armed Services Committee; relating to judge advocates; relating to military facility zones; relating to the appointment of an assistant adjutant general; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Establish Ak Military Affairs Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | House | FN2: (GOV) |
2024-09-03 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 268 |
2024-09-03 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/30/24 |
2024-08-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2024-08-01 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 18 SLA 24 |
2024-07-16 | House | 9:00 A.M. 7/16/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-05-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DIBERT, RAUSCHER |
2024-05-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-15 | House | CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y37 N3 |
2024-05-15 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 24 |
2024-05-15 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP |
2024-05-15 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2024-05-15 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 155(FIN) |
2024-05-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2024-05-15 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2024-05-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 155(FIN) |
2024-05-15 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, GRAY-JACKSON, STEDMAN, TOBIN, HUGHES, KAUFMAN |
2024-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2024-05-15 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2024-05-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2024 |
2024-05-12 | Senate | FN2: (GOV) |
2024-05-12 | Senate | AM: HOFFMAN, BISHOP |
2024-05-12 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2024-05-12 | Senate | DP: OLSON, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK |
2024-05-12 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 24 |
2024-05-12 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1NR 2AM NEW TITLE |
2024-04-24 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MERRICK, SHOWER, BISHOP, STEDMAN, STEVENS |
2024-04-02 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, MYERS, DUNBAR, BJORKMAN |
2024-04-02 | Senate | FIN |
2024-04-02 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-01 | House | VERSION: CSHB 155(FIN) AM |
2024-04-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-04-01 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 |
2024-04-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 155(FIN) AM |
2024-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GROH, SADDLER, CRONK, WRIGHT, MCCABE, JOSEPHSON |
2024-03-28 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR |
2024-03-28 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-28 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-28 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-28 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2024 |
2024-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN |
2024-02-15 | House | FN2: (GOV) |
2024-02-15 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON |
2024-02-15 | House | D.JOHNSON, EDGMON |
2024-02-15 | House | DP: CRONK, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, GALVIN, HANNAN, STAPP, TOMASZEWSKI, FOSTER, |
2024-02-15 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP 1NR |
2024-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COULOMBE |
2023-05-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI |
2023-05-08 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER MLV |
2023-05-08 | House | FN1: (GOV) |
2023-05-08 | House | DP: GRAY, CARPENTER, SADDLER, GROH, SHAW, WRIGHT |
2023-05-08 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP |
2023-04-10 | House | MLV |
2023-04-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appointments
Boards & Commissions
Buildings
Business
Construction
Contractors
Employment
Government Organization
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Labor
Military
Municipalities
Planning
Residency
Transportation
Veterans
Warfare
Boards & Commissions
Buildings
Business
Construction
Contractors
Employment
Government Organization
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Labor
Military
Municipalities
Planning
Residency
Transportation
Veterans
Warfare