AK HB148 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - COSPONSOR(S): TILTON
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - COSPONSOR(S): TILTON
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to service areas in second class boroughs; relating to a municipal tax exemption or deferral for economic development property; relating to a municipal tax exemption for a fire protection system; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Second Class Borough Service Areas
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Chenault [R] | Rep. Gary Knopp [R] | Rep. Dan Saddler [R] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2017-04-17 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2017-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 148(STA) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2017-04-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2017-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 148(STA) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-16 | Senate | STA SCS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2017 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2017-04-14 | Senate | DP: MEYER, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN |
2017-04-14 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 11 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | STA RPT SCS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2017-04-06 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE |
2017-04-03 | Senate | STA |
2017-04-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-31 | House | VERSION: HB 148 |
2017-03-31 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, JOSEPHSON |
2017-03-31 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-03-31 | House | PASSED Y35 E4 A1 |
2017-03-31 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 148 |
2017-03-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-31 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-31 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2017 |
2017-03-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-03-10 | House | DP: WESTLAKE, SADDLER, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, RAUSCHER, FANSLER, PARISH |
2017-03-10 | House | CRA RPT 7DP |
2017-03-01 | House | CRA |
2017-03-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |