AK HB147 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to teacher certificates for retired teachers.
Title
Retired Teacher Certificate
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Dibert [D] | Rep. Mike Prax [R] | Rep. Jennifer Armstrong [D] | Rep. Donna Mears [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Himschoot [I] | Rep. Conrad McCormick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-03-27 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC |
2024-03-20 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2024-03-20 | House | NR: ALLARD |
2024-03-20 | House | DP: HIMSCHOOT, PRAX, STORY, MCKAY, MCCORMICK, RUFFRIDGE |
2024-03-20 | House | EDC RPT 6DP 1NR |
2024-02-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCORMICK |
2024-02-15 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2024-02-15 | House | DP: CARRICK, FIELDS, SADDLER, PRAX, RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER |
2024-02-15 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2024-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT |
2023-05-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MEARS |
2023-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG |
2023-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRAX |
2023-03-29 | House | L&C, EDC |
2023-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB147 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0147A.PDF |