AK HB141 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to allocations of funding for the Alaska Workforce Investment Board; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ak Workforce Investment Board;funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 as amended (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Return to Finance Committee (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 as amended (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Return to Finance Committee (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2017-10-06 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/29 CHAPTER 24 SLA 17 |
2017-10-06 | House | 11:00 AM 8/22/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-05-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-05-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-05-10 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1 |
2017-05-10 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2017-04-19 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2017-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 141(FIN) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2017-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, KELLY |
2017-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 141(FIN) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-17 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FN12: (UA) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FN11: (LWF) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | FN10: (LWF) CORRECTED |
2017-04-17 | Senate | FN9: (LWF) CORRECTED |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FN8: (EED) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN7: (LWF) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN6: (LWF) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN5: (LWF) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN4: (UA) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN1: (EED) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, STEVENS, MEYER, GARDNER |
2017-04-14 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE |
2017-04-12 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2017-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-12 | House | VERSION: HB 141 |
2017-04-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-09 | House | ENGROSSED |
2017-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH |
2017-04-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-09 | House | PASSED Y34 N5 E1 |
2017-04-09 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-09 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2017-04-09 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2017-04-09 | House | AM NO 1 AS AM FAILED Y2 N37 E1 |
2017-04-09 | House | RETURN HB 141 BACK TO FINANCE - Y17 N22 E1 |
2017-04-09 | House | AM 2 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y22 N17 E1 |
2017-04-09 | House | AM 1 TO AM 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2017-04-09 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2017-04-09 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2017-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 141 |
2017-04-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2017-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR |
2017-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2017 |
2017-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, DRUMMOND |
2017-04-07 | House | FN7: (LWF) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN6: (LWF) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN5: (LWF) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN4: (UA) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2017-04-07 | House | AM: WILSON, TILTON |
2017-04-07 | House | NR: PRUITT |
2017-04-07 | House | DP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GRENN, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-04-07 | House | FIN RPT 8DP 1NR 2AM |
2017-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO |
2017-03-13 | House | FN4: (UA) |
2017-03-13 | House | FN3: (LWF) |
2017-03-13 | House | FN2: (LWF) |
2017-03-13 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2017-03-13 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH |
2017-03-13 | House | DP: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KNOPP, KITO |
2017-03-13 | House | L&C RPT 5DP 2NR |
2017-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2017-02-22 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Education
Employment
Labor
Salaries & Allowances
Sunset
Unemployment
Universities
Vocational Training
Education
Employment
Labor
Salaries & Allowances
Sunset
Unemployment
Universities
Vocational Training