AK HB135 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to school district participation in the school construction grant program.
Title
School Construction Grant Program
Sponsors
Rep. John Lincoln [D] | Rep. Dean Westlake [D] | Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] |
Rep. Zach Fansler [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Justin Parish [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/18 |
2018-08-09 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/8 CHAPTER 78 SLA 18 |
2018-08-01 | House | 3:50 PM 8/1/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-10 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2 |
2018-05-10 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-08 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-07 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 135(FIN) |
2018-05-07 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 135(FIN) |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-07 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-07 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-07 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE, BISHOP |
2018-05-03 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE |
2018-02-14 | House | RETURNED TO SENATE |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL REPRINTED ALL VERSIONS 2/14/18 |
2018-02-14 | House | PRIME SPONSOR: LINCOLN |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE |
2018-02-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, BEGICH, COGHILL, HUGHES |
2017-04-14 | Senate | EDC RPT 4DP |
2017-04-06 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-05 | House | VERSION: CSHB 135(EDC) AM |
2017-04-05 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH |
2017-04-05 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-04-05 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-05 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-05 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2017-04-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 135(EDC) |
2017-04-03 | House | HELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR |
2017-03-31 | House | HELD TO 4/3 CALENDAR |
2017-03-29 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR |
2017-03-29 | House | EDC CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-03-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-29 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2017-03-22 | House | NR: TALERICO, KOPP |
2017-03-22 | House | DP: PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, JOHNSTON, FANSLER, DRUMMOND |
2017-03-22 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 5DP 2NR |
2017-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER |
2017-02-20 | House | EDC |
2017-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |