AK HB127 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to compensation of the ombudsman and to employment of staff by the ombudsman under personal service contracts; relating to disclosure by an agency to the ombudsman of communications subject to attorney-client and attorney work-product privileges; relating to the privilege of the ombudsman not to testify and creating a privilege under which the ombudsman is not required to disclose certain documents; relating to procedures for procurement by the ombudsman; and amending Rules 501 and 503, Alaska Rules of Evidence.
Title
Ombudsman
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14 |
2014-06-20 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 38 SLA 14 |
2014-06-13 | House | 2:19 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-22 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-04-18 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E1 A3 |
2014-04-18 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-18 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-18 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 127(JUD) |
2014-04-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-18 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 127(JUD) |
2014-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(COR) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, DYSON |
2014-04-16 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2014-04-11 | Senate | JUD |
2014-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 127(JUD) |
2014-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-09 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-09 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2014-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 127(JUD) |
2014-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR |
2014-04-08 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | FN7: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-04-01 | House | FN6: ZERO(COR) |
2014-04-01 | House | FN5: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-01 | House | FN4: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-01 | House | NR: NEUMAN |
2014-04-01 | House | AUSTERMAN |
2014-04-01 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, |
2014-04-01 | House | FIN RPT CS(JUD) NT 9DP 1NR |
2014-03-25 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD |
2014-03-25 | House | FN3: (ADM) |
2014-03-25 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2014-03-25 | House | NR: LEDOUX, PRUITT |
2014-03-25 | House | DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER |
2014-03-25 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 2NR |
2014-03-10 | House | FN3: (ADM) |
2014-03-10 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-03-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2014-03-10 | House | AM: KELLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES |
2014-03-10 | House | NR: GATTIS |
2014-03-10 | House | DP: LYNN |
2014-03-10 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 1DP 1NR 3AM |
2013-02-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2013-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Civil Procedure
Court Rules
Disclosure
Ethics
Executive Branch
Governor
Legislative Agencies
Ombudsman
Privileges & Immunities
Procurements
Public Employees
Public Officers
Rights
Salaries & Allowances
Subpoenas
Witnesses
Court Rules
Disclosure
Ethics
Executive Branch
Governor
Legislative Agencies
Ombudsman
Privileges & Immunities
Procurements
Public Employees
Public Officers
Rights
Salaries & Allowances
Subpoenas
Witnesses