AK HB108 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-10 - REPORT REC'D: DEC/SHELLFISH SAMPLING
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-10 - REPORT REC'D: DEC/SHELLFISH SAMPLING
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations for the operating and loan program expenses of state government and for certain programs, capitalizing funds, amending appropriations, and making reappropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Operating Budget/loans/funds
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | REPORT REC'D: DEC/SHELLFISH SAMPLING | |
2012-01-23 | REPORTS REC'D: ADM/AK LAND MOBILE RADIO | |
2011-08-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2011-08-24 | PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS | |
2011-08-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 3 FSSLA 11 | |
2011-06-24 | 10:50 AM 6/8/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-06-27 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/3/11 | |
2011-06-27 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/3/11 | |
2011-06-24 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2011-05-06 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-05-06 | CC RPT ADPTD Y38 E2 CCS HB 108 | |
2011-05-06 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-05-06 | CC RPT ADPTD Y14 N1 E5 CCS HB 108 | |
2011-05-06 | CC REPORT TAKEN UP | |
2011-05-05 | FISCAL NOTE PACKET | |
2011-05-05 | CC REPORT READ AND HELD | |
2011-05-05 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2011-05-05 | FISCAL NOTE PACKET | |
2011-05-05 | CC REPORT: CCS HB 108 | |
2011-04-18 | SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-04-18 | SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-04-11 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2011-04-09 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2011-04-06 | HOFFMAN (CHAIR), STEDMAN, THOMAS | |
2011-04-06 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2011-04-06 | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 A1 | |
2011-04-06 | RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2011-04-05 | THOMAS (CHAIR), STOLTZE, GARA | |
2011-04-05 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2011-04-05 | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N38 E2 | |
2011-04-04 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2011-04-01 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 108(FIN) AM S | |
2011-04-01 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2011-04-01 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-01 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N- | |
2011-04-01 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC | |
2011-04-01 | HOFFMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2011-04-01 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-01 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2011-04-01 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2011-04-01 | AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-01 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-01 | AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-01 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-01 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N16 | |
2011-04-01 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-01 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15 | |
2011-04-01 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-01 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 108(FIN) | |
2011-03-30 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR | |
2011-03-30 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-03-30 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-03-30 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-28 | DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2011-03-28 | FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE | |
2011-03-11 | FIN | |
2011-03-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-03-10 | VERSION: CSHB 108(FIN) | |
2011-03-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-03-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-03-10 | PASSED Y36 N3 E1 | |
2011-03-10 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2011-03-10 | AM NO 4 FAILED Y11 N28 E1 | |
2011-03-10 | AM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N29 E1 | |
2011-03-10 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y10 N28 E1 A1 | |
2011-03-10 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1 | |
2011-03-10 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 & ALL AMS UC | |
2011-03-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 108(FIN) | |
2011-03-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/10 CALENDAR | |
2011-03-09 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-03-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-03-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-03-09 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, | |
2011-03-09 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP | |
2011-01-18 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2011-01-18 | FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Budget Reserve Fund
Courts
Education
Energy
Executive Branch
Federal Aid
Funds
Housing
Legislature
Loans
Permanent Fund
Public Finance
Retirement
Salaries & Allowances
State Aid
Universities
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Budget Reserve Fund
Courts
Education
Energy
Executive Branch
Federal Aid
Funds
Housing
Legislature
Loans
Permanent Fund
Public Finance
Retirement
Salaries & Allowances
State Aid
Universities