AK HB105 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the programs and bonds of the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority; relating to the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority sustainable energy transmission and supply development fund; repealing bond authorizations granted to the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority; amending the definition of 'qualified energy development'; relating to the financing authorization through the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority of a liquefied natural gas production plant and natural gas energy projects and distribution systems in the state; requiring the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority to deliver to the legislature reports relating to the Interior energy project; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Aidea: Bonds;programs;loans;lng Project
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: CSHB 105(FIN) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: CSHB 105(FIN) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD |
2016-04-06 | Senate | QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD |
2016-04-06 | House | QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD |
2016-01-19 | Senate | QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD |
2015-10-24 | Senate | QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD |
2016-01-19 | House | QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD |
2015-09-10 | House | QUARTERLY INTERIOR ENERGY PROJECT REPORT RECD |
2015-09-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/15 |
2015-09-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 39 SLA 15 |
2015-09-10 | House | 1:30 PM 6/15/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-27 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E2 |
2015-04-27 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2015-04-27 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 105(FIN) AM S |
2015-04-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2015-04-26 | Senate | ENGROSSED |
2015-04-26 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-26 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2015-04-26 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-26 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2015-04-26 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2015-04-26 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-25 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/25 - ON 4/26 CALENDAR |
2015-04-24 | Senate | HELD TO 4/25 CALENDAR UC |
2015-04-24 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/23 - ON 4/24 CALENDAR |
2015-04-22 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR |
2015-04-21 | Senate | HELD TO 4/22 CALENDAR UC |
2015-04-21 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-20 | Senate | HELD TO 4/21 CALENDAR UC |
2015-04-20 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR UC |
2015-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 105(FIN) |
2015-04-19 | Senate | HELD TO 4/20 CALENDAR UC |
2015-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR |
2015-04-18 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2015 |
2015-04-18 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-18 | Senate | NR: DUNLEAVY |
2015-04-18 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2015-04-18 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 18 |
2015-04-18 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2015-04-16 | Senate | FIN |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-15 | House | VERSION: CSHB 105(FIN) |
2015-04-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-15 | House | PASSED Y37 N2 A1 |
2015-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 105(FIN) |
2015-04-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-15 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-15 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-15 | House | NR: GATTIS, PRUITT, SADDLER |
2015-04-15 | House | DP: MUNOZ, EDGMON, KAWASAKI, GARA, WILSON, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON |
2015-04-15 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3NR |
2015-04-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-10 | House | AM: JOSEPHSON, SEATON, TARR |
2015-04-10 | House | NR: HERRON, TALERICO |
2015-04-10 | House | DP: JOHNSON, OLSON, HAWKER, NAGEAK |
2015-04-10 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 2NR 3AM |
2015-03-25 | House | L&C REFERRAL REMOVED |
2015-02-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-02-25 | House | DP: NAGEAK, WOOL, TILTON, TALERICO, CLAMAN, COLVER, VAZQUEZ |
2015-02-25 | House | ENE RPT CS(ENE) 7DP |
2015-02-11 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2015-02-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-02-11 | House | ENE, RES, L&C, FIN |
2015-02-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Bonds & Bonding
Business
Economic Development
Energy
Finance
Loans
Oil & Gas
Public Corporations
Revenue
State Aid
Utilities
Business
Economic Development
Energy
Finance
Loans
Oil & Gas
Public Corporations
Revenue
State Aid
Utilities