AK HB10 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/9/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/9/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Funter Bay marine park unit of the state park system; relating to protection of the social and historical significance of the Unangax cemetery located in Funter Bay; providing for the amendment of the management plan for the Funter Bay marine park unit; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Funter Bay Marine Park: Unangan Cemetery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/9/21 |
2021-06-09 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/8 CHAPTER 3 SLA 21 |
2021-06-07 | House | 10:45 A.M. 6/7/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-28 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: HB 10 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK, MICCICHE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, BISHOP, STEVENS, HOLLAND, HUGHES, BEGICH, |
2021-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 10 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | DP: REVAK, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, MICCICHE, KIEHL |
2021-05-14 | Senate | RES RPT 5DP |
2021-05-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | NR: MYERS, WILSON |
2021-05-07 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-05-07 | Senate | CRA RPT 2DP 2NR |
2021-04-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, KAWASAKI |
2021-04-12 | Senate | CRA, RES |
2021-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-09 | House | VERSION: HB 10 |
2021-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, DRUMMOND, ZULKOSKY, EDGMON |
2021-04-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 N3 E1 |
2021-04-09 | House | PASSED Y31 N8 E1 |
2021-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 10 |
2021-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY, JOSEPHSON, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR |
2021-04-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR |
2021-04-07 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N21 |
2021-04-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2021-04-05 | House | NR: RAUSCHER, GILLHAM |
2021-04-05 | House | DP: MCKAY, FIELDS, CRONK, HOPKINS, HANNAN, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK |
2021-04-05 | House | RES RPT 7DP 2NR |
2021-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2021-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2021-03-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2021-03-12 | House | DP: FIELDS, ORTIZ, CRONK, ZULKOSKY |
2021-03-12 | House | TRB RPT 4DP |
2021-03-03 | House | RES REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER TRB |
2021-02-24 | House | TRB REPLACES FIN REFERRAL |
2021-02-18 | House | RES, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |