AK HB10 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
Pending: House Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
Pending: House Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to child-in-need-of-aid proceedings; relating to child protection; and amending Rules 6(a), 6(b)(2) and (3), 10(c)(2) and (3), 10(e)(2), 10.1, 15(f)(2), 17(c), 17(d)(2), 17.1(b), 17.1(d)(3), 17.2(a), 17.2(e), 17.2(f), 17.3, 18(c), and 19.1(c), Alaska Child in Need of Aid Rules of Procedure, and repealing Rules 17.1(a), 17.1(c), and 17.1(d)(2), Alaska Child in Need of Aid Rules of Procedure.
Title
Child In Need Of Aid/protection; Duties
Sponsors
Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. George Rauscher [R] | Rep. Dean Westlake [D] |
Rep. David Eastman [R] | Rep. Charles Kopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2017-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN |
2017-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE |
2017-01-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2017-01-18 | House | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2017-01-18 | House | HSS, JUD |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |
Subjects
Child Abuse
Court Rules
Courts
Domestic Violence
Families
Foster Care
Guardianship
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Judges
Minors
Natives
Rights
Court Rules
Courts
Domestic Violence
Families
Foster Care
Guardianship
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Judges
Minors
Natives
Rights
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB10 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0010A.PDF |