WY SJ0005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to require voter approval before any mill levy, property tax assessment percentage, tax on real estate transactions or tax on real estate services can be imposed or increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners bill of rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-22SenateS03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback