WY SJ0004 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Nayes: Senator(s) Case, Hines, Johnson, Martin and Scott Ayes 0 Nays 5 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution by adding a requirement that specified officials and other persons receive specified constitutional instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional instruction for elected and other persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-02 ROLL CALL Nayes: Senator(s) Case, Hines, Johnson, Martin and Scott Ayes 0 Nays 5 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-03-02 (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
2011-01-26 (S) Introduced and Referred to S07; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-12-21 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback