WY SF0169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 207 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 207 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; limiting the acreage authorized for a migratory bird refuge in Lincoln county; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Migratory bird refuge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Chapter No. 207 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-14 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-14 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0072 | |
2017-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0072 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0072 |
2017-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0072 | |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-15 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2017-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |