WY SF0157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the attorney general; providing for the election of the attorney general; designating the attorney general as a state elected official; setting the attorney general's term of office; providing for filling a vacancy in the position; repealing provision for interim appointment; providing for the application of the Ethics and Disclosure Act to the office of the attorney general; amending certain provisions regarding actions the attorney general takes requiring approval of or pursuant to the direction of the governor; prescribing additional duties of the attorney general; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney general-elected official.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2019-02-01SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback