WY SF0152 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to higher education; repealing Hathaway provisional opportunity scholarship; providing for continuation of existing provisional opportunity scholarships as opportunity scholarships; requiring students to file federal student aid forms for Hathaway scholarship eligibility; modifying continuing eligibility requirements and removing limitations based upon semesters of eligibility for scholarships; providing for total scholarship amounts as specified; limiting use of non-need based scholarships to tuition and mandatory fees; repealing provisions for movement between scholarship levels and establishing total scholarship amounts at initial eligibility levels; conforming other Hathaway student scholarship provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hathaway student scholarships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2017-02-06 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Rerefer to S04 - Education |
2017-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2017-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-01 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |