WY SF0151 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; providing for establishment of a tax free enterprise zone program; authorizing tax credits for certain manufacturers as specified; providing definitions; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tax free enterprise zones.
Sponsors
Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and referred to S03; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0151.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0151.pdf |