WY SF0142 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; providing requirements for the capture and use of carbon dioxide from coal-fired electric generation facilities; requiring public utilities to offer coal-fired electric generation facilities for sale for purposes of carbon capture for enhanced oil and gas recovery; specifying requirements for the sale of byproducts from carbon dioxide streams; specifying purposes; seeking to identify already incurred liabilities for decommissioning and cleanup of coal-fired electric generation facilities as specified; specifying intent for the reduction of waste of carbon dioxide; providing penalties for violations; providing definitions; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; requiring studies; requiring reports; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Carbon capture and sequestration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-6-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-6-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-03 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | :Refer to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |