WY SF0142 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 203 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to community mental health and substance use services; authorizing the creation of a contract program for mental health and substance use treatment programs to reduce the demand for involuntary commitments; providing an appropriation; authorizing the expenditure of funds appropriated for involuntary commitments for program operation as specified; authorizing the department of health to enter into contracts for operation of the program as specified; requiring annual reports; amending eligibility provisions concerning department of health contracts with private agencies; prohibiting fees to clients for gatekeeping services as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community mental health contract program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14 Chapter No. 203 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-14 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-14 Governor Signed SEA No. 0087
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0087
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0087
2017-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0087
2017-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2017-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2017-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-28HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-23HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2017-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2017-02-03HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-02-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2017-02-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-31SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-30SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2017-01-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback