WY SF0139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish licenses; amending provisions related to license expirations; requiring rulemaking; amending provisions related to reservations of certain unused licenses; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Game and fish licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] |
Rep. Garry Piiparinen [R] | Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2017-02-03 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-31 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |