WY SF0138 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0069
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the investment of state funds; authorizing the purchase or purchases of real property assets and associated interests and other actions regarding a purchase as specified; specifying requirements for any purchase; specifying sources of funding for purchases; providing for the treatment and management of purchased assets; providing for distribution of earnings from purchased assets; creating the property tax payment reimbursement account; requiring reports; requiring public notice and a public comment period and meeting; requiring approval by the legislature prior to entering into any purchase agreement; providing for reimbursement to local governments in lieu of property taxes as specified; specifying other required arrangements for any purchase; requiring recommendations; authorizing the retention of consultants; authorizing reviews, studies and recommendations as alternatives to executing any authorized purchase; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investment of state funds-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Adopted SF0138JC002: 46-10-4-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted SF0138JC002: 24-3-3-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Amendment adopted 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30 Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0069
2020-03-30 Veto Message Received
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0069
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0069
2020-03-12 Assigned Number SEA No. 0069
2020-03-12HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-12SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-12HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11SenateConcur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0
2020-03-11SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-11House3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0
2020-03-10House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-09HouseCOW:Passed
2020-03-09HousePlaced on General File
2020-03-09HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2020-03-04HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2020-03-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2020-02-26Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-19SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/SF0138.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Engross/SF0138.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Enroll/SF0138.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/SF0138.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#237
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#-296
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#447
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#446
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#-703
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#5545
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#644
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#660
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0138#5588

Bill Comments

feedback