WY SF0134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mine product taxes; providing exemptions for production of crude oil and natural gas; providing limitations on the exemptions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Severance tax-exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0134JC001: 21-31-8-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted SF0134JC001: 24-4-2-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Failed 3-24-3-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-21-2-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-28SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-28HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-27SenateConcur:Failed 3-24-3-0-0
2019-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 37-21-2-0-0
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-20HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-01SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-01SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback