WY SF0132 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 171 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to housing discrimination; defining prohibited practices; providing for conciliation and hearings; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Fair Housing Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 171 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0071
2015-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0071
2015-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0071
2015-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0071
2015-03-04SenateConcur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2015-03-04SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-03House3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0
2015-03-02House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2015-02-27House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-26HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-23 Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2015-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-04Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2015-02-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-02SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-30 Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback