WY SF0129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-19-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-19-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; providing for expansion of coverage to low income persons as specified; authorizing a Medicaid demonstration waiver and state plan amendment; providing waiver and plan amendment requirements as specified; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid SHARE plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion failed by roll call 10- (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-19-0-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion failed by roll (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-19-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-02 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-19-0-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion failed by roll (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-19-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-02 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 11-19-0-0-0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | COW:Laid Back |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-28 | Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/SF0129.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/SF0129.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/SF0129.pdf |