WY SF0127 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; creating the Wyoming Stable Token Act; creating the Wyoming stable token commission; authorizing the Wyoming stable token commission to issue Wyoming stable tokens as specified; providing for employees; specifying limitations; providing immunity; providing definitions; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Stable Token Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 20-9-2-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-25-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-25-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Assigned Chapter Number 185 | |
2023-03-17 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0085 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0085 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0085 |
2023-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0085 | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Concur:Passed 20-9-2-0-0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-25-1-0-0 |
2023-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-27 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-24 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-24 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |