WY SF0125 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-22-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to daylight saving time; requiring an application for the state to transfer time zones; establishing a new uniform state time; making legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permanent mountain daylight saving time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-22-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Failed 8-22-0-0-0
2017-02-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-02SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-01SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-01SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2017-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback