WY SF0123 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the lottery corporation; clarifying definitions; clarifying the corporation's authority to regulate the conduct of lottery games including keno games; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery games-keno.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateCOW:S Did not consider for COW
2021-03-08SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-08SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-03-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-02-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback