WY SF0122 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil procedure; codifying an exemption from civil liability for public utilities as specified; specifying applicability of the Wyoming Governmental Claims Act; specifying legislative intent; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public utilities-liability exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-21-2-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 77 | |
2020-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0033 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0033 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0033 |
2020-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0033 | |
2020-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 37-21-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-02 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2020-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |