WY SF0121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to municipal solid waste facilities cease and transfer projects; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Municipal solid waste cease and transfer-appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-4-2-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number 67 | |
2019-02-19 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0033 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0033 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0033 |
2019-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0033 | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 24-4-2-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-23 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |