WY SF0121 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state funded facilities; providing appropriations for state funded capital construction; providing for conditions and other requirements related to state funded capital construction projects; amending supplemental coverage for university revenue bonds to extend the program and expand it to include community college district revenue bonds; establishing accounts; providing for continuous appropriations as specified; specifying duties of the state construction department and the department of administration and information; requiring reports; providing definitions; providing funding and conditions of mineral impacted road projects; providing for real property lease negotiations as specified; providing additional appropriations; authorizing a loan for a veterans' skilled nursing care facility; and providing for effective dates.
Title
State funded capital construction-2 (Sub #1).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-0-0-1 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-0-0-1 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-0-0-1 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-0-0-1 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Adopt JCC #2 |
2018-03-10 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2018-03-10 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2018-03-10 | JCC Requested a New Committee to be Appointed | |
2018-03-10 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-0-0-1 |
2018-03-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-03-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-2-1-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |