WY SF0121 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 169 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Pharmacy Act; modifying grounds for suspension and revocation of pharmacy licenses; modifying responsibilities of the secretary of the state board of pharmacy; modifying provisions related to examination and reexamination; modifying mailing requirements for license renewal notices and examination notices; removing authorization for the board to credit continuing education units to another year; modifying drug substitution procedures; modifying definitions; removing obsolete language; repealing provisions related to pharmacist pedigree documents; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Pharmacy Act-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08 Chapter No. 169 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0082
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0082
2017-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0082
2017-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0082
2017-03-02SenateConcur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2017-03-02SenateReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-01House3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0
2017-02-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-22HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-22HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2017-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2017-02-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-02SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-02SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-02SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2017-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback