WY SF0120 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of government; creating the office of guardian ad litem; modifying administration of guardian ad litem program; repealing provisions related to office of the public defender oversight of the program; making conforming amendments; providing for continuation of contracts; providing for rulemaking; reappropriating funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of guardian ad litem-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2020-02-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2020-02-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-20SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-5-0-0-0
2020-02-12SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback