WY SF0119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; adopting a risk profile standard for the investment of funds of the state which may be invested in equities, including stocks; repealing specified maximum amounts of state permanent funds which may be invested in equities including stocks; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Investment of state permanent funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Assigned Chapter Number 58 | |
2021-04-01 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0018 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0018 |
2021-03-29 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0018 | |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-27 | Bill Number Assigned |