WY SF0119 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state funded capital construction; creating accounts; providing definitions; providing appropriations for purposes related to state funded capital construction; modifying prior appropriations; making certain appropriations subject to specified terms and conditions; providing for the reversion and transfer of funds; creating a subcommittee; providing for the acceptance of gifts of real property; requiring reporting; specifying funding priorities; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State funded capital construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-17-0-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Amendment failed 7-23-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Amendment adopted 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Amendment adopted 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Amendment adopted 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12Senatepostponed indefinitely
2020-03-12HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-12SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-04HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-03SenateConcur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0
2020-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-03House3rd Reading:Passed 43-17-0-0-0
2020-03-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-28HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-28HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-28HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-26HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2020-02-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
2020-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-14SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-3-0-0-0
2020-02-12SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/SF0119.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Engross/SF0119.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/SF0119.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#222
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#-185
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#335
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#336
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#337
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#338
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#390
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#-523
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#5419
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0119#484

Bill Comments

feedback