WY SF0118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for tax lien priority for liens on mineral production; providing for continual and perpetual liens on mineral production for ad valorem taxes as specified; providing requirements prior to filing an action to foreclose or enforce an ad valorem tax lien; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax liability mineral production.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - Adopted SF0118JC001: 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted SF0118JC001: 17-10-3-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Failed 9-20-1-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 187
2019-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0082
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0082
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0082
2019-02-27 Assigned Number SEA No. 0082
2019-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-27SenateConcur:Failed 9-20-1-0-0
2019-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-15HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-31SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-01-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback