WY SF0116 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Governor Signed SEA No. 0062 with Line Item Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of government; creating a task force on retirement income security; providing for a study of retirement preparedness and retirement savings programs; requiring a report; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement income security task force-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Governor Signed SEA No. 0062 with Line Item Veto (Y: 0 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Veto Message Received (Y: 0 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0062 with Line Item Veto
2018-03-15 Assigned Chapter Number 132
2018-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0062
2018-03-10SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0062
2018-03-10 Assigned Number SEA No. 0062
2018-03-10SenateConcur:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
2018-03-10SenateReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-09House3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0
2018-03-08House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-07HouseCOW:Passed
2018-03-05HousePlaced on General File
2018-03-05HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2018-03-01House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2018-03-01HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2018-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2018-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-19SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0
2018-02-15SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback