WY SF0115 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; repealing provision relating to warrantless searches; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Warrantless searches-repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Leland Christensen [R] | Sen. Gerald Geis [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Sen. John Hines [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] |
Rep. Mike Greear [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA0052 | |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0052 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0052 |
2014-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA0052 | |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2014-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |